CA AB1839 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.2 (commencing with Section 69617.7) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 6049) to Chapter 5 of Title 7 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: education and hiring grants.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69617.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6049 | New Code | See Bill Text |