CA AB1880 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state real property.
Title
State real property: reversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1880 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1880 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |