CA AB2014 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7070 of the Government Code, relating to military equipment.
Title
Military Equipment: definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |