CA AB2037 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Polling places: alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2037 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB2037 Flora (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2037 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB2037 Flora (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2037 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5875.). |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4686.). |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and G.O. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 4746.) |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and G.O. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 12288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |