CA AB2106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3480, 3682.1, 3684, 3700.1, and 3701 of, and to add Section 3467.5 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to wildlife habitat.
Title
Wildlife habitat: Nesting Bird Habitat Incentive Program: upland game bird hunting validation: state duck hunting validation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2106 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2106 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4702.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3467.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3682.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3684 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3700.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |