CA AB2114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4433.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4433.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3571.5 to the Government Code, relating to higher education employment relations.
Title
Higher Education Employer-Employee Relations Act: procedures relating to employee termination or discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2114 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2114 Rodriguez By Pan (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2114 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2114 Rodriguez By Pan (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2114 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4433.). | |
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 15. Page 5361.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 4785.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3571.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |