CA AB2128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 5011.4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to parks.
Title
State parks: California Admission Day: discounted admission.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2128 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2128 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4925.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5011.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |