CA AB2128 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.10 and 23621.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income and corporation taxes: credits: work opportunity credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23621.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |