CA AB2147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1203.4b to the Penal Code, relating to convictions.
Title
Convictions: expungement: incarcerated individual hand crews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2147 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2147 Reyes et al. By Bradford (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2147 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2147 Reyes et al. By Bradford (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2147 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 12. Page 5384.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 0. Page 4856.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4747.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |