CA AB2168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65850.75 to the Government Code, relating to zoning, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Planning and zoning: electric vehicle charging stations: permit application: approval.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2168 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2168 |