CA AB2229 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51931 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
California Healthy Youth Act: menstrual health education.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] | Asm. Diane Papan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |