CA AB2247 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18400.1, 18420, 18424, and 18502 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome Parks Act: enforcement: notice of violations: Manufactured Housing Opportunity and Revitalization (MORE) Program: annual fee.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18400.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |