CA AB2276 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4584, 4584.1, 4584.2, and 4589 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 399.20.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to forestry.
Title
Forestry: timber harvesting plans: exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4584.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4584.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4589 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.20.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |