CA AB2295 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 801.1 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: commencement of prosecution.
Sponsors
Asm. Dawn Addis [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 801.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |