CA AB2336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11370.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: armed possession: fentanyl.
Sponsors
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] | Sen. Marie Alvarado-Gil [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Esmeralda Soria [D] |
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |