CA AB2399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3302 and 3307 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to paid family leave.
Title
Paid family leave: qualifying exigency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2399 INS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2399 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2399 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4374.). |
2020-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |