CA AB2442 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 870.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: expedited licensure process: gender-affirming health care and gender-affirming mental health care.
Sponsors
Asm. Rick Zbur [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 870.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |