CA AB2443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1770 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer remedies.
Title
Deceptive practices: debt settlement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2443 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 4815.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |