CA AB2543 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14836.1 to the Government Code, relating to small business.
Title
Small Business Procurement and Contract Act: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14836.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |