CA AB2545 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 496 of the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft: receiving stolen property: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |