CA AB2546 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7070 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement agencies.
Title
Law enforcement and state agencies: military equipment: funding, acquisition, and use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 6.) |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |