CA AB2573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16061.8 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Trusts: notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2573 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 16061.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |