CA AB259 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12651 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 19441 of, to add Section 19573 to, and to add Part 27 (commencing with Section 50300) to Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Wealth Tax: False Claims Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD. |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19573 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB259 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB259#99INT |