CA AB2593 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6539.8.5 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Joint Exercise of Powers Act: Sacramento County Partnership on Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6539.8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |