CA AB2661 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 454.57 of the Public Utilities Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 37860) to Part 8.1 of Division 13 of the Water Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: transmission facility planning: Westlands Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 37860 | New Code | See Bill Text |