CA AB2757 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5207.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5207.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 35. Page 5218.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5207.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5207.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 35. Page 5218.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 554 of, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 857) to Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Agricultural workers: wages, hours, and working conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2757 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2757 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1 (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2757 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1 (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5207.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5207.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 35. Page 5218.). |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 554 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 857 | New Code | See Bill Text |