CA AB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17085 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: qualified employer plan: loans: CARES Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 276 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB276 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 276 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB276 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 276 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5378.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3890.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17085 | Amended Code | Citation Text |