CA AB2843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.37 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.211 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: rape and sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.211 | New Code | See Bill Text |