CA AB2882 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1230, 1230.1, and 6027 of, and to add Section 1230.2 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
California Community Corrections Performance Incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1230.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1230.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |