CA AB2948 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16120 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Adoption Assistance Program: tribal court order.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |