CA AB2984 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 803 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Fleeing the scene of an accident.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |