CA AB2987 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66281.4 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: sex discrimination complaints: status updates and notices.
Sponsors
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Mike Fong [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66281.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |