CA AB3077 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1385 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4336 and 4361 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: borderline personality disorder.
Sponsors
Asm. Gregg Hart [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 17). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4336 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |