CA AB3092 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12525 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Attorney General: law enforcement agencies: reporting requirements: deaths.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |