CA AB3126 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 104.14 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
Department of Transportation: state highway property: information requests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 104.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |