CA AB314 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6388.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and Use Tax: exemptions: trucks for use in interstate or out-of-state commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB314 Jim Patterson By Dahle (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 314 Jim Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 314 Jim Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2763.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1178.) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6388.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |