CA AB3153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.3.5 (commencing with Section 65918.5) to Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to planning and zoning.
Title
Parking and zoning: bicycle and car-share parking credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3153 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 4701.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 2). |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65918.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |