CA AB3160 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12206, 17058, and 23610.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Insurance, income, and corporation taxes: credits: low-income housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17058 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23610.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |