CA AB3181 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 17.9 (commencing with Section 7315) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to detention facilities.
Title
Detention facilities: Due Process in Detention Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3181 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3181 |