CA AB3211 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 41 (commencing with Section 22949.90) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to artificial intelligence.
Title
California Provenance, Authenticity and Watermarking Standards.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22949.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |