CA AB3241 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12525.6 to the Government Code, and to add Sections 13519.16, 13519.17, and 13519.18 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: police canines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13519.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13519.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13519.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |