CA AB3245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.668 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10123.207 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Coverage for colorectal cancer screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.668 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |