CA AB3286 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.106, 1798.121, 1798.130, 1798.135, 1798.140, 1798.150, 1798.155, 1798.160, 1798.185, 1798.199.25, 1798.199.40, 1798.199.45, 1798.199.90, and 1798.199.95 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018: monetary thresholds: grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 18. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.199.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.199.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.199.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.199.90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.199.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |