CA AB352 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56.101 and 56.108 of, and to add Section 56.110 to, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 130290 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health information.
Title
Health information.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 352 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB352 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Atkins (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 352 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB352 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Atkins (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 352 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 3529.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2702.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 2000.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |