CA AB376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.6C.10 (commencing with Section 1788.100) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 28104, 28112, 28130, and 28140 of, and to repeal Sections 28134 and 28136 of, the Financial Code, relating to student loans.
Title
Student loan servicing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 376 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB376 Mark Stone et al. By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 376 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB376 Mark Stone et al. By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 376 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5351.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4404.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 2032.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 28104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28134 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28136 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |