CA AB394 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18766 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to personal income tax.
Title
Personal income tax: voluntary contributions:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB394 Yamada By Knight (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - AB 394 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - AB 394 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1977.). |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1038.) |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1002.) |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |