CA AB418 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to tidelands and submerged lands.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: City and County of San
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 418 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB418 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 418 AMMIANO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB418 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 418 AMMIANO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3130.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2385.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-01 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |