CA AB433 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7026.12 and 7057 of, and to add and repeal Section 7026.13 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 13110 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: fire protection systems: fire safety: State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 433 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB433 Gordon By Hueso (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 433 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB433 Gordon By Hueso (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 433 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 10. Page 2918.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2106.). |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 876.) |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 2). |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7026.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7026.13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7057 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13110 | New Code | See Bill Text |