CA AB457 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(C).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(C).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14560 of the Public Resources Code, relating to beverage containers, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Beverage containers: recycling: redemption payment and refund value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB457 Joe Patterson By Blakespear (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 457 Joe Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 457 Joe Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(C). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2646.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1271.) |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |