CA AB492 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.9 of the Penal Code, relating to probation.
Title
Probation: nonviolent drug offenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB492 Quirk By Block (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 492 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 492 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1272.). |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1006.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |